Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994535

EP0994535 - Modular connector with reduced crosstalk [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2005
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 30.12.2009  [2009/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hirose Electric Co., Ltd.
5-23 Oosaki 5-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
HIROSE ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
5-23 Oosaki 5-chome
Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ezawa, Katsuya, c/o Hirose Electric Co., Ltd.
5-23 Oosaki 5-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Hirokawa, Kenichi, c/o Hirose Electric Co., Ltd.
5-23 Oosaki 5-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Pätzold, Herbert
Pätzold, Tandler, Riegger & Kollegen
Pasinger Strasse 6
82166 Gräfelfing / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/01]Pätzold, Herbert
Pätzold, Tandler, Riegger & Kollegen Steubstrasse 10
82116 Gräfelfing / DE
Former [2000/16]Pätzold, Herbert, Dr.-Ing.
Dr. Pätzold, Buhl-Müller, Tandler & Kollegen Steubstrasse 10
82166 Gräfelfing / DE
Application number, filing date99120284.711.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateJP1998029537816.10.1998         Original published format: JP 29537898
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994535
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994535
Date:30.01.2002
[2002/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994535
Date:05.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01R24/04
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2002/42]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Modularer Steckverbinder mit verringertem Übersprechen[2000/16]
English:Modular connector with reduced crosstalk[2000/16]
French:Connecteur modulaire avec diaphonie réduite[2000/16]
Examination procedure24.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/30]
31.07.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
16.11.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
12.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.2004Fee for grant paid
08.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.09.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
04.09.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5362257  (NEAL DONALD R [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 57 - column 7, line 19 *;
 [A]EP0658953  (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 42 - column 6, line 31 *;
 [A]EP0865117  (BERG ELECTRONICS MFG [NL]) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 53 - column 8, line 3 *