Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994439

EP0994439 - IC card [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.09.2002
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 06.11.2002  [2002/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Imagawa, Toshiyuki
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte
Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date99120322.512.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateJP1998029057213.10.1998         Original published format: JP 29057298
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994439
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/07
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Chipkarte[2000/16]
English:IC card[2000/16]
French:Carte à puce[2000/16]
Examination procedure30.08.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03