EP0995663 - Industrial truck with a steering device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STILL GmbH Berzeliusstrasse 10 22113 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states STILL GMBH Berzeliusstrasse 10 D-22113 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Logemann, Ulf, Dipl.-Ing. Heidkamp 9 21447 Handorf / DE | 02 /
Bromberg, Thorald, Dipl.-Ing. Lütjenseer Strasse 49 22946 Trittau / DE | 03 /
Neuf, Ottmar, Dipl.-Ing. Dornröschenweg 2 21465 Reinbek / DE | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde Aktiengesellschaft Patent und Marken Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde Aktiengesellschaft, Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 99120323.3 | 12.10.1999 | [2000/17] | Priority number, date | DE1998147933 | 19.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19847933 | DE1999139293 | 19.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19939293 | [2000/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0995663 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0995663 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/18, B60N2/14 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
B66F9/07568 (EP);
B62D1/18 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/17] | B62D1/18 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/23] |
Former [2000/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flurförderzeug mit einer Lenkvorrichtung | [2000/17] | English: | Industrial truck with a steering device | [2000/17] | French: | Chariot de manutention avec un dispositif de direction | [2000/17] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/46] | 10.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.04.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.04.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1401914 (HANS STILL AG) [X] 1-3 * figure 2; claims 2,3 *; | [XY]US2988931 (MARKLEY JR VERN C, et al) [X] 1-3,5 * column 4, line 2 - column 5, line 5; figures 7-12 * * column 7, lines 8-12 * [Y] 4,6-8; | [XY]DE2908906 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 9-12,14 * page 14, line 13 - page 16, line 6; figures 1-4 * [Y] 13,15-17; | [Y]US3800903 (BEALS D, et al) [Y] 4,13 * column 3, lines 54-67; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]US5036942 (LOEWEN KEL W [CA]) [Y] 6-8,15-17 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 48; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]FR1350695 (STEELS ENGINEERING PRODUCTS LT) [Y] 6-8,15-17 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0518002 (JUNGHEINRICH AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2440303 (FENWICK MANUTENTION STE INDLE) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US3737003 (BEALS D, et al) [A] 1,9 * the whole document * |