Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994519

EP0994519 - Electrolyte solution filling method and battery structure of lithium secondary battery [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.06.2009
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NGK Insulators, Ltd.
2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
NGK INSULATORS, LTD.
2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-City, Aichi Prefecture 467-8530 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nemoto, Hiroshi
126-401, Myoen-cho, Minami-ku
Nagoya-city, Aichi-prefecture, 457-0022 / JP
02 / Kitoh, Kenshin
211-2, Ubakoyama 4-chome, Midori-ku
Nagoya-city, Aichi-prefecture, 458-0830 / JP
03 / Enomoto, Akio
14-7, Aza-shimogengo Ohaza-morioka, Higashiura-cho
Chita-gun, Aichi-prefecture, 470-2101 / JP
[2000/16]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/33]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/16]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99120325.812.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateJP1998029083213.10.1998         Original published format: JP 29083298
JP1998031326604.11.1998         Original published format: JP 31326698
JP1998033429125.11.1998         Original published format: JP 33429198
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994519
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994519
Date:13.09.2000
[2000/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01M2/36, H01M2/26
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2001/22]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrolytlösungs-Füllungsverfahren und Struktur einer Lithiumsekundärbatterie[2000/16]
English:Electrolyte solution filling method and battery structure of lithium secondary battery[2000/16]
French:Méthode de remplissage avec une solution d' électrolyte et structure d'une pile secondaire au lithium[2000/16]
Examination procedure13.12.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/06]
14.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/31]
11.03.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
26.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
30.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
31.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
30.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0913874  (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [PX] 18-24,26-28,30 * column 3, line 3 - line 8; claims 1-10 *;
 [X]EP0822605  (ACCUMULATEURS FIXES [FR]) [X] 18-30 * column 2, line 42 - line 48; claims 1-31 * * column 4, line 52 - line 58 * * column 5, line 4 - line 15 *;
 [X]EP0771040  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 18-26 * column 12, line 25 - line 60; figures 4,10; claims 1-18 *;
 [X]JPS62264563  ;
 [X]JPS579074  ;
 [X]JPS5830073  ;
 [X]JPS5830072  ;
 [X]JPS5760674  ;
 [X]JPS5715368  ;
 [X]DE895011  (VOGT HANS DR H C) [X] 1,9-11 * figures 1-3; claims 1-6 *;
 [A]EP0660431  (ACCUMULATEURS FIXES [FR]) [A] 1-17 * figure 1; claims 1-8 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880510), vol. 012, no. 150, Database accession no. (E - 606), [X] 1,2,6,9-11 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820428), vol. 006, no. 067, Database accession no. (E - 104), [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830511), vol. 007, no. 107, Database accession no. (E - 174), [X] 1,2,6,9-11 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820723), vol. 006, no. 136, Database accession no. (E - 120), [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820514), vol. 006, no. 077, Database accession no. (E - 106), [X] 1,2 * abstract *