Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994026

EP0994026 - Method and machine for packing a product [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AZIONARIA COSTRUZIONI MACCHINE AUTOMATICHE-A.C.M.A.-S.p.A.
Via Cristoforo Colombo 1
40131 Bologna / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
AZIONARIA COSTRUZIONI MACCHINE AUTOMATICHE-A.C.M.A.-S.p.A.
Via Cristoforo Colombo 1
I-40131 Bologna / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Corniani, Carlo
Via Ferrari, 33
46045 Marmirolo / IT
02 / Risi, Roberto
Via Zampieri, 11
40033 Casalecchio di Reno / IT
03 / Maggi, Attilio
Via Zigagnolo, 13
46040 Ponti sul Mincio / IT
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Eccetto, Mauro , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Eccetto, Mauro , et al
Studio Torta S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date99120343.112.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateIT1998BO0057513.10.1998         Original published format: IT BO980575
[2000/16]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994026
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994026
Date:21.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65B21/24
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Maschine zum Verpacken eines Gegenstands[2000/16]
English:Method and machine for packing a product[2000/16]
French:Proçédé et machine pour emballer un produit[2000/16]
Examination procedure18.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
26.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.01.2004Fee for grant paid
26.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.04.2004
BE21.04.2004
CY21.04.2004
FI21.04.2004
NL21.04.2004
DK21.07.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
PT21.09.2004
IE12.10.2004
LU12.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/18]AT21.04.2004
BE21.04.2004
CY21.04.2004
FI21.04.2004
NL21.04.2004
DK21.07.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
IE12.10.2004
LU12.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2006/13]AT21.04.2004
BE21.04.2004
FI21.04.2004
NL21.04.2004
DK21.07.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
IE12.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/45]AT21.04.2004
BE21.04.2004
FI21.04.2004
DK21.07.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/18]AT21.04.2004
BE21.04.2004
FI21.04.2004
DK21.07.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2005/14]AT21.04.2004
BE21.04.2004
FI21.04.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2005/11]AT21.04.2004
FI21.04.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2005/06]FI21.04.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2005/02]FI21.04.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2004/52]SE21.07.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4018140  (KISTERS) [A] 1,4 * column 5, line 21 - column 6, line 36; figures 2,3 *;
 [D]US5148654  (KUESTERS KARL [DE]);
 [A]US3332207  (MIDNIGHT MARGARET C) [A] 1,4 * column 5, line 74 - column 6, line 16; figures 8-13 *;
 [A]US3516219  (NIGRELLI BIAGIO J, et al) [A] 1,4 * column 10, line 73 - column 11, line 39; figure 6 *
by applicantUS5148654
 US5667055