Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995545

EP0995545 - Device for presetting a tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2017Revocation of patentpublished on 22.11.2017  [2017/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
M&F Maschinen- und Fertigungsanlagen-Optimierung Josef Nagel
Pfälzerstrasse 17
66453 Reinheim / DE
[2007/10]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
M&F Maschinen- und Fertigungsanlagen-Optimierung Josef Nagel
Pfälzerstrasse 17
66453 Reinheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Nagel, Josef
Pfälzerstrasse 17
66453 Reinheim / DE
02 / Becker, Thomas, Dr.-Ing.
Taubentalstrasse 2
66806 Ensdorf / DE
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Wolff, Matthias , et al
Patentanwälte Bernhardt/Wolff
Partnerschaft mbB
Europaallee 17
66113 Saarbrücken / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/20]Wolff, Matthias , et al
Patentanwälte Bernhardt/Wolff
Partnerschaft
Europaallee 17
66113 Saarbrücken / DE
Former [2000/17]Bernhardt, Winfrid, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Bernhardt Kobenhüttenweg 43
66123 Saarbrücken / DE
Application number, filing date99120380.313.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateDE199814807919.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19848079
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995545
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0995545
Date:03.04.2002
[2002/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995545
Date:07.03.2007
Language:DE
[2007/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01B11/02, B23Q17/09, B23Q17/22, B23Q17/24
[2002/13]
Former International [2000/17]B23Q17/09, B23Q17/22, B23Q17/24
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2003/01]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Werkzeugvoreinstellung[2000/17]
English:Device for presetting a tool[2000/17]
French:Appareil de preréglage d'un outil[2000/17]
Examination procedure26.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
30.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2006Fee for grant paid
22.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.12.2007  17.12.2007  ADMISSIBLE
E. Zoller GmbH & Co. KG
Einstell- Messgeräte Planckstrasse 10
71691 Freiberg/ Neckar / DE
Opponent's representative
Daub, Thomas
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub
Bahnhofstrasse 5
88662 Überlingen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/03]
Opponent(s)01  07.12.2007   
E. Zoller GmbH & Co. KG
Einstell- Messgeräte Planckstrasse 10
71691 Freiberg/ Neckar / DE
Opponent's representative
Daub, Thomas
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Seepromenade 17
88662 Überlingen / DE
14.01.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.07.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.11.2011Date of oral proceedings
16.12.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.10.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.11.2014
10.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
08.12.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
18.12.2014Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/47]
Appeal following opposition20.02.2012Appeal received No.  T0368/12
26.04.2012Statement of grounds filed
20.03.2013Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
20.03.2013Date of oral proceedings
02.04.2013Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
23.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200305   M06   Fee paid on   10.12.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB13.10.2013
IT13.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
SE14.10.2013
FR31.10.2013
DE01.05.2014
[2015/23]
Former [2014/38]GB13.10.2013
IT13.10.2013
SE14.10.2013
FR31.10.2013
DE01.05.2014
Former [2014/37]GB13.10.2013
SE14.10.2013
FR31.10.2013
DE01.05.2014
Former [2014/34]GB13.10.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB2200747  (SWIFT KENNETH GEOFFREY, et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-9 * the whole document * [Y] 4;
 [X]US4966460  (KAHLEY THEODORE E [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * column 2, line 1 - line 55 * * column 3, line 10 - line 14 *;
 [XA]DE8601152U  (SITZMANN & HEINLEIN GMBH) [X] 1,2,4-7 * page 6, line 5 - line 18; figure 1 * [A] 9;
 [XY]DE3811551  (HERKT PETER [DE]) [X] 1,4 * abstract * [Y] 2,3;
 [XY]DE3905949  (SCHULZ HERBERT PROF DR ING [DE], et al) [X] 1,5-7 * column 1, line 12 - line 43 * * column 4, line 11 - line 14 * [Y] 2-4;
 [YA]EP0289084  (LYSAGHT AUSTRALIA LTD [AU]) [Y] 2,3 * column 5, line 15 - line 21 * * column 12, line 7 - line 28 * [A] 4;
 [Y]US4566225  (BIZOT HENRI [FR], et al) [Y] 2,3 * column 2, line 39 - line 42 *;
 [Y]DE3743717  (SPITZLEY ALFRED DIPL ING [DE]) [Y] 4 * column 3, line 60 - line 61 *;
 [A]DE2138366  (WOHLHAUPTER E & CO [DE]) [A] 1,5 * column 2, line 68 - column 3, line 6 *;
 [A]DE19629616  (HEILIG & SCHWAB GMBH [DE]) [A] 5 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19632148  (GFE GES FUER FERTIGUNGSTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 6 * column 3, line 46 - line 51 *