Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994231

EP0994231 - Thrust chain drive [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.12.2003
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.01.2004  [2004/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aumüller Aumatic GmbH
Steinerne Furt 58a
86167 Augsburg / DE
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Früh, Werner
Am Mittleren Stadtbach 2
89312 Günzburg / DE
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Ernicke, Hans-Dieter
Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke
Schwibbogenplatz 2b
86153 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Ernicke, Hans-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing.
Schwibbogenplatz 2b
86153 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date99120382.913.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateDE1998218339U14.10.1998         Original published format: DE 29818339 U
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994231
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994231
Date:29.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:E05F15/12
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   IT,   LI [2001/01]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kettenschubantrieb[2000/16]
English:Thrust chain drive[2000/16]
French:Entraînement à chaîne en poussée[2000/16]
Examination procedure28.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
24.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.2002Fee for grant paid
09.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP0708218  (SCHLUETER HEINRICH [DE]) [X] 1,3,11,12 * column 10, line 38 - line 56 * * column 14, line 10 - line 17; figures 2,10 * [A] 5 [Y] 13;
 [Y]GB2225609  (TRUTH INC [US]) [Y] 13 * abstract * * page 8, line 18 - page 10, line 22; figures 4-7 *;
 [A]US1333595  (ANDERSON NILS H) [A] 2 * page 2, line 18 - line 28 * * page 2, line 46 - line 54; figure 13 *;
 [A]AU516364B  (WHITCO HARDWARE MFG) [A] 1,5 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 1; figure 4 *
by applicantDE29514179U