blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0993819


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.11.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.01.2004  [2004/02]
17.10.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  03.12.2003  [2003/49]
05.09.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.10.2003  [2003/43]
29.08.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.10.2003  [2003/42]
13.06.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.07.2003  [2003/31]
06.06.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.07.2003  [2003/30]
30.05.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.07.2003  [2003/29]
16.05.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.07.2003  [2003/27]
25.10.2002 (Expected) grant published on  11.12.2002  [2002/50]
25.10.2002 Change - inventor published on  11.12.2002  [2002/50]
09.10.2002 Renewal fee
28.08.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.06.2002 Communication of intention to grant
28.06.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.05.2002 Communication of intention to grant
03.01.2002 Examination report or reply
12.11.2001 Examination report or reply
26.10.2001 First examination report
25.10.2001 Examination report or reply
27.09.2001 Renewal fee
01.06.2001 Definitive list of designations published on  18.07.2001 [2001/29]
09.02.2001 Request for examination filed published on  28.03.2001 [2001/13]
07.02.2001 Change - extension states
15.09.2000 Publication of search report published on  02.11.2000 [2000/44]
03.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]