blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0993819
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3995853BGlobal Dossier 24.10.2007B2
JP2001170135 26.06.2001A
Priority number Date
US45230099 01.12.1999
JP35418999 14.12.1999
CA2293919 31.12.1999
DE19847594 15.10.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0993819Global Dossier 11.12.2002B1
EP0993819 02.11.2000A3
EP0993819 19.04.2000A2
Priority number Date
US45230099 01.12.1999
JP35418999 14.12.1999
CA2293919 31.12.1999
DE19847594 15.10.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT229312T 15.12.2002T
Priority number Date
US45230099 01.12.1999
JP35418999 14.12.1999
CA2293919 31.12.1999
DE19847594 15.10.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2293919 30.06.2001A1
Priority number Date
US45230099 01.12.1999
JP35418999 14.12.1999
CA2293919 31.12.1999
DE19847594 15.10.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE19847594 08.06.2000C1
Priority number Date
US45230099 01.12.1999
JP35418999 14.12.1999
CA2293919 31.12.1999
DE19847594 15.10.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59903726D 23.01.2003D1
Priority number Date
US45230099 01.12.1999
JP35418999 14.12.1999
CA2293919 31.12.1999
DE19847594 15.10.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2185287T 16.04.2003T3
Priority number Date
US45230099 01.12.1999
JP35418999 14.12.1999
CA2293919 31.12.1999
DE19847594 15.10.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6659994 09.12.2003B1
Priority number Date
US45230099 01.12.1999
JP35418999 14.12.1999
CA2293919 31.12.1999
DE19847594 15.10.1998