Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993819

EP0993819 - Bag for containing two separate substances that are to be mixed [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 07.01.2004  [2004/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nutrichem Diät + Pharma GmbH
Am Espan 1-3
91154 Roth / DE
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Mader, Helmut
Steiner Strasse 13
91161 Hilpoltstein / DE
02 / Krause, Michael
Plecher Strasse 14
90482 Nürnberg / DE
03 / Schwietz, Horst Dr.
Am Wiesengrund 13
90548 Allersberg / DE
04 / Fritzmeier, Franz Dr.
Hermann-Löns-Weg 6
91710 Gunzenhausen / DE
05 / Baumann, Karlheinz
Nordring 77
91154 Roth / DE
 [2002/50]
Former [2000/16]01 / Mader, Helmut
Steiner Strasse 13
91161 Hilpoltstein / DE
02 / Krause, Michael
Plecher Strasse 14
90482 Nürnberg / DE
03 / Schwietz, Horst Dr.
Am Wiesengrung 13
90548 Allersberg / DE
04 / Fritzmeier, Frank Dr.
Hermann-Löns-Weg 6
91710 Gunzenhausen / DE
05 / Baumann, Karlheinz
Nordring 77
91154 Roth / DE
Representative(s)Zech, Stefan Markus , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Zech, Stefan Markus Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patentanwälte Meissner, Bolte & Partner Karolinenstrasse 27
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date99120421.514.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateDE199814759415.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19847594
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0993819
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0993819
Date:02.11.2000
[2000/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993819
Date:11.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61J1/10
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
Extension statesAL24.01.2001
LT24.01.2001
LV24.01.2001
MK24.01.2001
RO24.01.2001
SI24.01.2001
TitleGerman:Beutel für zwei getrennt aufzubewahrende und zu mischende Substanzen[2000/16]
English:Bag for containing two separate substances that are to be mixed[2000/16]
French:Poche contenant deux substances séparées devant être mélangées[2000/16]
Examination procedure24.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/13]
30.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
15.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2002Fee for grant paid
13.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
IE11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
[2004/02]
Former [2003/43]FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
IE11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/42]GR11.12.2002
IE11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/31]GR11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/30]NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/29]PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/27]SE11.03.2003
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE19600530  (NUTRICHEM DIAET & PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * column 4, line 21 - line 31; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4601704  (LARKIN MARK E [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 20 - line 31; figure - *;
 [A]WO9103224  (POLAK ROBERT B [US]) [A] 1 * page 18, line 9 - line 20; figure 2B *;
 [PA]DE19751489  (NUTRICHEM DIAET & PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1 * column 7, line 19 - line 62; figures 5A-5C *
by applicantDE19600530