EP1024254 - Method and apparatus for controlling an exhaust gas after-treatment system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/31] | Method and apparatus to control an exhaust gas after-treatment system | ||
[2004/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.2006 [2006/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weyer, Klaus Reuchlinstrasse 17b 70178 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Mahr, Bernd, Dr. Panoramastrasse 83 73207 Plochingen / DE | 03 /
Hupfeld, Bernd, Dr. Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 33 38518 Gifhorn / DE | 04 /
Unger, Stefan Roetestrasse 45 70197 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/31] | Application number, filing date | 99120452.0 | 14.10.1999 | [2000/31] | Priority number, date | DE1999103439 | 29.01.1999 Original published format: DE 19903439 | [2000/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1024254 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1024254 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | [2003/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1024254 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20, F01N3/36, F01N9/00 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
B01D53/9495 (EP);
F01N3/208 (EP);
F01N2550/00 (EP);
F01N2610/02 (EP);
F01N2900/1621 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/31] | F01N3/20, F01N9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/10] |
Former [2000/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung eines Abgasnachbehandlungssystems | [2000/31] | English: | Method and apparatus for controlling an exhaust gas after-treatment system | [2004/23] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de commande d' un système de post-traitement des gaz d'échappement | [2004/23] |
Former [2000/31] | Method and apparatus to control an exhaust gas after-treatment system | ||
Former [2000/31] | Procédé et dispositif de commande d' un système de traitement ultérieur des gaz d'échappement | Examination procedure | 11.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 20.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0822323 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,9,12,14 * abstract * * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 7 * * column 4, line 18 - line 36 * * column 4, line 52 - line 56 * * figures 2,4,5,6B *; | [X]EP0498598 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,9,10,13,14 * abstract * * column 4, line 45 - column 8, line 27 * * column 8, line 52 - column 9, line 25 * * column 10, line 36 - column 11, line 47 * * figure 6 *; | [X]EP0708230 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9,14 * column 4, line 25 - line 32 * * column 4, line 57 - line 59 * * column 5, line 14 - line 38 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0828063 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 3,8,10,11,13 * column 4, line 11 - line 46 * * column 8, line 23 - column 9, line 4 * * figures 1,2 *; | [DA]EP0621400 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [DA] 1,14 * column 5, line 20 - column 6, line 32 * * figures 1,3 * |