Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993896

EP0993896 - Welding apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  27.03.2009
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.03.2009Revocation of patentpublished on 29.04.2009  [2009/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2005/37]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-0050 / JP
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shimogama, Shigeru
Sanraizuseiwadai-205,2-1-100, Seiwadai-higashi
Kawanishi-shi, Hyogo 666-0142 / JP
[2000/16]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/33]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/16]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99120457.914.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateJP1998029477116.10.1998         Original published format: JP 29477198
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993896
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993896
Date:14.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B23K9/127
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   IT,   NL,   SE [2001/01]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schweissgerät[2000/16]
English:Welding apparatus[2000/16]
French:Appareil de soudage[2000/16]
Examination procedure13.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
07.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2005Fee for grant paid
22.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.06.2006  20.07.2006  ADMISSIBLE
OTC Daihen Europe GmbH
Krefelder Strasse 675-677
41066 Mönchengladbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Bonsmann, Joachim Bernhard, et al
Bonsmann . Bonsmann . Frank
Patentanwälte
Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35 a
41063 Mönchengladbach / DE
 02  14.06.2006  26.06.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Lincoln Global, Inc.
14824 Marquardt Avenue
Santa Fe Springs CA 90670 / US
Opponent's representative
Schumacher, Horst, et al
Palgen, Schumacher & Kollegen Frühlingstrasse 43A
45133 Essen / DE
 03  14.06.2006  23.06.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Daihen Corporation
2-1-11, Tagawa, Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-8512 / JP
Opponent's representative
Pluckrose, Anthony William, et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2008/30]
Opponent(s)01  13.06.2006  20.07.2006  ADMISSIBLE
OTC Daihen Europe GmbH
Krefelder Strasse 675-677
41066 Mönchengladbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Bonsmann, Joachim Bernhard, et al
Bonsmann & Bonsmann Patentanwälte Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35 a
41063 Mönchengladbach / DE
 02  14.06.2006  26.06.2006  ADMISSIBLE
LINCOLN GLOBAL, INC.
14824 Marquardt Avenue
Santa Fe Springs CA 90670 / US
Opponent's representative
Schumacher, Horst, et al
Palgen, Schumacher & Kollegen Frühlingstrasse 43A
45133 Essen / DE
 03  14.06.2006  23.06.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Daihen Corporation
2-1-11, Tagawa, Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-8512 / JP
Opponent's representative
Pluckrose, Anthony William, et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2006/30]
Opponent(s)01  13.06.2006   
OTC Daihen Europe GmbH
Krefelder Strasse 675-677
41066 Mönchengladbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Bonsmann, Joachim Bernhard, et al
Bonsmann & Bonsmann Patentanwälte Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35 a
41063 Mönchengladbach / DE
 02  14.06.2006   
LINCOLN GLOBAL, INC.
14824 Marquardt Avenue
Santa Fe Springs CA 90670 / US
Opponent's representative
Schumacher, Horst, et al
Palgen, Schumacher & Kollegen Frühlingstrasse 43A
45133 Essen / DE
 03  15.06.2006   
Daihen Corporation
2-1-11, Tagawa, Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-8512 / JP
Opponent's representative
Pluckrose, Anthony William, et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
25.07.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.04.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.11.2008Date of oral proceedings
10.11.2008Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/18]
11.12.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.12.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4616326  (MEIER CHRISTOF [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 9, line 37 - line 44; figure 15 *;
 [Y]US4590577  (NIO SATORU [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 8, paragraph L - line 30; figure 8 *
ExaminationCA2194937
 US5148000
 JPH0985443
 US5305183