Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1005849

EP1005849 - Two-phase composition for treating the hair or the scalp [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.07.2002
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 15.12.2004  [2004/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wella Aktiengesellschaft
Berliner Allee 65
64274 Darmstadt / DE
[2000/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Koschik, Achim
Heidelberger Landstrasse 101 c
64297 Darmstadt / DE
02 / Breda, Carina
Konrad-Adenauer-Strasse 16
64354 Reinheim / DE
03 / Jahedshoar, Mehrdad
4376 North Willow Glen Str.
Calabasas, CA 91302 / US
04 / Eicken, Ulrich
Chemin des Kybourg 33
1700 Fribourg / CH
05 / Jungo, Sybille
Route du Confin 22
1723 Marly / CH
06 / Bormuth, Hiltrud
Reichelsheimer Strasse 6
64658 Fürth / DE
[2000/23]
Application number, filing date99120517.015.10.1999
[2000/23]
Priority number, dateDE199815576703.12.1998         Original published format: DE 19855767
[2000/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1005849
Date:07.06.2000
Language:DE
[2000/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1005849
Date:19.09.2001
Language:DE
[2001/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/00, A61K7/06, A61K7/48
[2000/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/23]
TitleGerman:Zweiphasige Zusammensetzung zur Haar- oder Kopfhautbehandlung[2000/23]
English:Two-phase composition for treating the hair or the scalp[2000/23]
French:Composition à deux phases pour le traitement des cheveux ou du cuir chevelu[2000/23]
Examination procedure15.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/23]
15.10.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
17.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
05.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.07.2001Fee for grant paid
25.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)20.06.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/37]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY19.09.2001
FI19.09.2001
IE19.09.2001
NL19.09.2001
AT15.10.2001
LU15.10.2001
MC15.10.2001
BE31.10.2001
DK19.12.2001
PT19.12.2001
GR21.12.2001
[2004/51]
Former [2004/39]CY19.09.2001
FI19.09.2001
IE19.09.2001
NL19.09.2001
AT15.10.2001
LU15.10.2001
MC15.10.2001
BE31.10.2001
DK19.12.2001
PT19.12.2001
Former [2004/05]CY19.09.2001
FI19.09.2001
IE19.09.2001
NL19.09.2001
AT15.10.2001
MC15.10.2001
BE31.10.2001
DK19.12.2001
PT19.12.2001
Former [2003/46]FI19.09.2001
IE19.09.2001
NL19.09.2001
AT15.10.2001
MC15.10.2001
BE31.10.2001
DK19.12.2001
PT19.12.2001
Former [2003/31]FI19.09.2001
IE19.09.2001
NL19.09.2001
AT15.10.2001
MC15.10.2001
BE31.10.2001
PT19.12.2001
Former [2003/06]FI19.09.2001
IE19.09.2001
NL19.09.2001
MC15.10.2001
BE31.10.2001
PT19.12.2001
Former [2002/48]FI19.09.2001
IE19.09.2001
MC15.10.2001
PT19.12.2001
Former [2002/43]FI19.09.2001
MC15.10.2001
PT19.12.2001
Former [2002/27]FI19.09.2001
PT19.12.2001
Former [2002/15]FI19.09.2001
Documents cited:Search[DXA]DE2259756  (SHISEIDO CO LTD) [DX] 2,3,5,7-12,14 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 3 * * page 19, paragraph 3 * * examples 11,12 * * figure - * [A] 1,13;
 [XA]US4767741  (KOMOR JOSEPH A [US], et al) [X] 2,3,5,7,9-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 14 * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 9 * * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 21 * * column 3, line 48 - line 58 * * column 4, line 48 - line 57 * * table I * * column 7, line 23 - line 42 * [A] 1,13,14;
 [X]EP0490750  (OREAL [FR]) [X] 2,3,5,8-10,12 * abstract * * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 3 * * page 3, line 25 - line 36 * * examples 2,4 *;
 [XA]EP0870495  (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 2,3,5,9-11,14 * abstract * * page 3, line 57 - page 4, line 14 * * page 5, line 46 - page 7, line 17 * * page 7, line 37 - line 39 * * examples 8,9 * * claim 4 * [A] 1,4,13;
 [A]US5725844  (GERS-BARLAG HEINRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,5,7,10,11,13 * abstract * * column 3, line 10 - line 24 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 14 * * column 5, line 10 - line 18 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 10 * * examples 6,7 *