Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1004462

EP1004462 - Operating keypad, especially for vehicle air conditioning system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.10.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Preh-Werke GmbH & Co. KG
An der Stadthalle
97616 Bad Neustadt a.d. Saale / DE
[2000/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Bauer, Karl-Heinz
Lerchenstrasse 9
97616 Bad Neustadt / DE
02 / Storath, Joachim
Lerchenheid 20
97616 Salz / DE
03 / Kirchner, Thilo
Steinbergstrasse 19
97705 Premich / DE
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Dietrich, Barbara , et al
Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
[2009/48]
Former [2000/43]Dietrich, Barbara , et al
Rheinmetall AG Zentrale Patentabteilung Postfach 10 42 61
40033 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2000/41](deleted)
...
Former [2000/22]Pfeiffer, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing.
c/o Jagenberg AG Rheinmetall Allee 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date99120582.416.10.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateDE199815375321.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19853753
[2000/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1004462
Date:31.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1004462
Date:26.11.2003
Language:DE
[2003/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60H1/00, H01H13/70
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/07]
Former [2000/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bedientastatur, insbesondere für eine Kraftfahrzeug-Klimaanlage[2000/22]
English:Operating keypad, especially for vehicle air conditioning system[2000/22]
French:Clavier d'utilisation, notamment pour un dispositif de climatisation pour véhicule[2000/22]
Examination procedure21.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
16.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.07.2003Fee for grant paid
05.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0157037  (BOWMAR INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-5 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 35; figures 1,2,4 *;
 [X]US5588760  (SO HENRY [TW]) [X] 1,3 * column 3, line 41 - column 3, line 56; figures 4,5 *;
 [XA]US5120923  (KATO TAKAFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 4, line 7 - line 68; figures 2,3 * * figure 6 * [A] 2;
 [A]DE19627212  (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1,4 * column 5, line 14 - column 5, line 27; figures 2-4 *;
 [A]US4918271  (DEEG REINHARD [DE]) [A] 2 * figure 4 *;
 [A]GB2150722  (MUELLER ROLF) [A] 4 * page 2, line 20 - line 67; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19627213  (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 7 * column 4, line 8 - line 21; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4635354  (CHROBAK MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 7 * column 9, line 58 - column 10, line 15; figure 8 *;
 [A]DE4410512  (PAFF STANNOL LOETMITTEL [DE]) [A] 8 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 32; figure 1 *