Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995772

EP0995772 - Aqueous polymer dispersion, production process therefor, and aqueous release agent [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.2005
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.05.2005  [2005/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD.
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd.
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nikaya, Toshiki
3-5-7-203, Uozakinakamachi, Higashinada-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 658-0083 / JP
02 / Akasaki, Ichimoto
7-6-21, Oginosatohigashi
Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-0248 / JP
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date99120615.218.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateJP1998030089122.10.1998         Original published format: JP 30089198
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995772
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0995772
Date:04.10.2000
[2000/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995772
Date:02.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08J3/03, // C09J7/02
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   IT [2001/25]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wässrige Polymerdispersion, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, und wässriges Trennmittel[2000/17]
English:Aqueous polymer dispersion, production process therefor, and aqueous release agent[2000/17]
French:Dispersion polymère aqueuse, procédé pour sa production et agent antiadhésif aqueux[2000/17]
Examination procedure16.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
14.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2004Fee for grant paid
18.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US5278228  (MATNER MARTIN [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * claims 1,2 * * column 7, line 67 - column 8, line 1 *;
 [X]EP0405317  (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4 * claim 1 * * examples 2,3 *;
 [X]US5449707  (HIGASHIURA SHINYA [JP], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1,7,16 * * column 2, line 32 - line 38 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 14 * * example 1 *;
 [A]JPH09104851  ;
 [A]US5633328  (TSUJINAKA KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,7 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US5413815  (WILLIAMS MARTIN M [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0409218  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 26, Database accession no. 1997-285277, XP002144459 & JPH09104851 A 19970422 (SEKISUI CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *