Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995905

EP0995905 - Piston for compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.11.2002
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2003  [2003/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho
2-1, Toyoda-cho, Kariya-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho
2-1, Toyoda-cho, Kariya-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sugiura, Manabu, K.K. Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Murao, Kazushige, K.K.Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
03 / Hoshida, Takahiro K.K.Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Pellmann, Hans-Bernd
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99120640.018.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateJP1998029709319.10.1998         Original published format: JP 29709398
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995905
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0995905
Date:25.10.2000
[2000/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:F04B27/08, F16J1/08
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2001/29]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kompressorkolben[2000/17]
English:Piston for compressor[2000/17]
French:Piston d'un compresseur[2000/17]
Examination procedure22.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/17]
02.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/01]
30.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/01]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE4115801  (MAHLE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 6 - line 28 *;
 [DY]EP0818625  (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [DY] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5314717  (ALT PETER [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *