Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1006231

EP1006231 - Method for controlling washload drying in a clothes drying or similar apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.12.2002  [2002/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Electrolux Zanussi S.p.A.
Via Giardini Cattaneo, 3
33170 Pordenone / IT
[2000/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Bianchin, Fabrizio
Via Stradelle 28
33170 Pordenone / IT
02 / Frucco, Giuseppe
Via Tiro a Segno 25
33170 Pordenone / IT
03 / Santarossa, Gianni
Via S. Agnese 9/A
33080 Porcia, Pordenone / IT
04 / Napolitano, Gennaro
Via Revedole 67
33170 Pordenone / IT
[2000/23]
Representative(s)Busca, Luciano , et al
PROPRIA S.r.l. Via Mazzini 13
33170 Pordenone / IT
[2000/23]
Application number, filing date99120655.819.10.1999
[2000/23]
Priority number, dateIT1998PN0008702.12.1998         Original published format: IT PN980087
[2000/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1006231
Date:07.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1006231
Date:31.10.2001
[2001/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:D06F58/28
[2000/23]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/29]
Former [2000/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Kontrolle der Wäschetrocknung in einem Wäschetrockner oder einer ähnlichen Maschine[2000/23]
English:Method for controlling washload drying in a clothes drying or similar apparatus[2000/23]
French:Procédé pour contrôler la charge de linge à sécher dans un séche linge ou appareil similaire[2000/23]
Examination procedure03.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/50]
17.06.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/50]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0481561  (WHIRLPOOL INT [NL]) [X] 1-4 * column 2, lines 8-32 * column 3, line 21 - column 5, line 33 * column 8, lines 16-49;; figures 1-7 *;
 [X]DE4211012  (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2232911  (LICENTIA PATENT-VERWALTUNG-GMBH) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *