Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1092830

EP1092830 - Door arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Torbau Schwaben
Enzianstrasse 14
88436 Oberessendorf / DE
[2001/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Guter, August
Lessingstrasse 4/5
88444 Ummendorf / DE
 [2001/16]
Representative(s)Kiessling, Christian
Rechtsanwalt, Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 40
85716 Unterschleissheim / DE
[2001/16]
Application number, filing date99120667.315.10.1999
[2001/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1092830
Date:18.04.2001
Language:DE
[2001/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1092830
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:E06B3/70
[2001/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/16]
TitleGerman:Tor-Vorrichtung[2001/16]
English:Door arrangement[2001/16]
French:Dispositif de porte[2001/16]
Examination procedure01.09.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/48]
07.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2003Fee for grant paid
01.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
17.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI04.06.2003
FR04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
IT04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
AT15.10.2003
CY15.10.2003
LU15.10.2003
BE31.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
[2008/17]
Former [2006/14]FI04.06.2003
FR04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
AT15.10.2003
CY15.10.2003
LU15.10.2003
BE31.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
Former [2005/13]FI04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
AT15.10.2003
CY15.10.2003
LU15.10.2003
BE31.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
Former [2005/02]FI04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
CY15.10.2003
LU15.10.2003
BE31.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
Former [2005/01]FI04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
CY15.10.2003
LU15.10.2003
BE31.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
Former [2004/44]FI04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
CY15.10.2003
LU15.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
Former [2004/39]FI04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
CY15.10.2003
LU15.10.2003
Former [2004/36]FI04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
CY15.10.2003
Former [2004/29]FI04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/22]FI04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/15]FI04.06.2003
IE04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/10]FI04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/05]FI04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/03]NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/02]NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2551753  (ANDRESEN DONALD DWAYNE) [X] 1,2,6-8,10,11,13,15,16 * page 7, paragraph 1 - page 13, paragraph 1 * * page 18, paragraph 4 - page 19, paragraph 1 * * figure - *;
 [X]US4132042  (DI MAIO VINCENT) [X] 1-3,7,13,14 * column 3, line 23 - line 49 * * column 5, line 10 - line 29 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US2511620  (MACMILLAN CLEMENTS) [X] 1,2,4,7-10,12,14 * column W *;
 [X]GB1279405  (TRANSTEC ENGINEERING COMPANY L) [X] 1,2,5-7,12 * page 1, line 22 - line 71; figure - *;
 [X]LU73411  (HALBERTSMA) [X] 1,2,6-9,14,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19654672  (SWAP TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [A] 15 * column 3, line 12 - line 25 *