Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996203

EP0996203 - Bulb socket for wedge-base bulb [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/17]Metal terminal for wedge-base bulb
[2010/05]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.06.2011
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.07.2011  [2011/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi
Mie-ken / JP
For all designated states
Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
8-3, Takanawa 4-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2010/30]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-shi Mie-ken / JP
For all designated states
Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
4-8-3, Takanawa, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sawada, Hisashi
c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-shi, Mie / JP
02 / Uchida, Kihachiro
c/o Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 500, Kitawaki Shimizu-shi
Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP
03 / Nitta, Kazuto
c/o Koito Manufacturing Co., 500, Kitawaki Shimizu-shi
Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP
 [2010/09]
Former [2000/17]01 / Sawada, Hisashi, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-shi, Mie / JP
02 / Uchida, Kihachiro
c/o Koito Manufacturing Co., 500, Kitawaki
Shimizu-shi, Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP
03 / Nitta, Kazuto
c/o Koito Manufacturing Co., 500, Kitawaki
Shimizu-shi, Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date99120717.619.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateJP1998029797120.10.1998         Original published format: JP 29797198
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0996203
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0996203
Date:16.04.2003
[2003/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0996203
Date:28.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:H01R33/09
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2004/02]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Sockel für Keilsockellampe[2010/05]
English:Bulb socket for wedge-base bulb[2010/05]
French:Culot pour ampoule à culot cunéiforme[2010/05]
Former [2000/17]Metallkontakt für Keilsockellampe
Former [2000/17]Metal terminal for wedge-base bulb
Former [2000/17]Contact métallique pour ampoule à culot cunéiforme
Examination procedure02.09.2003Examination requested  [2003/45]
11.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
11.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2010Fee for grant paid
11.06.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.04.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
20.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
12.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
14.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
13.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0434186  (INTERLOCK CORP [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 36 - line 42 * * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 11 * * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 21 - column 5, line 11; figures 1,2 *
ExaminationUS3017599
 US4902251
 EP0496901