EP1000741 - Electronic-paper printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | 05.02.2010 | Change - representative | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | ||
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimoda, Tatsuya c/o Seiko Epson Corp., 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Satoshi c/o Seiko Epson Corp., 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/20] | Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 99120725.9 | 19.10.1999 | [2000/20] | Priority number, date | JP19980301512 | 22.10.1998 Original published format: JP 30151298 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1000741 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1000741 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | [2000/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1000741 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/00 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
B41J3/4076 (EP,US);
B41J2/435 (KR);
G02F1/167 (EP,US);
G02F1/16757 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2001/17] |
Former [2000/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Drucker für elektronisches Papier | [2000/20] | English: | Electronic-paper printer | [2000/20] | French: | Imprimante à papier électronique | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 18.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 01.04.2009 | [2010/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0721176 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1,8,11,19* the whole document *; | [A]US5723204 (STEFIK MARK J [US]) [A] 1,8,11,19 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, paragraph 2; figures 1,6,7 *; | [PX]WO9854690 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [PX] 1,2,8-13,19,26 * page 9, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 1; figure 2 *; | [PX]EP0940261 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [PX] 1,8,11,19 * paragraph [0010]; figure 1 *; | [DA] - COMISKEY B ET AL, "7.4L: LATE-NEWS PAPER: ELECTROPHORETIC INK: A PRINTABLE DISPLAY MATERIAL", SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS,US,SANTA ANA, SID, (1997), vol. 28, ISSN 0097-966X, pages 75 - 76, XP000722661 [DA] 1,8,11,19 * page 1, column 2 * |