Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995914

EP0995914 - Metal fastener with inner thread for pass-through mounting [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2007
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG
Weinhalde 14-18
72178 Waldachtal / DE
[2006/23]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG
Weinhalde 14-18
72178 Waldachtal / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Frischmann, Albert
Hürnheimweg 3
79341 Kenzingen / DE
[2000/17]
Application number, filing date99120761.420.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateDE199814893123.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19848931
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995914
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0995914
Date:05.12.2001
[2001/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995914
Date:07.06.2006
Language:DE
[2006/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:F16B13/10, F16B13/06, F16B13/04
[2001/49]
Former International [2000/17]F16B13/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:Befestigungselement aus Metall mit Innengewinde für die Durchsteckmontage[2000/17]
English:Metal fastener with inner thread for pass-through mounting[2000/17]
French:Elément de fixation métallique à filetage interne pour montage traversant[2000/17]
Examination procedure23.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/26]
03.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2006Fee for grant paid
15.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
09.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
16.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
IE07.06.2006
DK07.09.2006
SE07.09.2006
GR08.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
LU20.10.2006
BE31.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT07.11.2006
[2010/06]
Former [2009/02]CY07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
IE07.06.2006
DK07.09.2006
SE07.09.2006
GR08.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
LU20.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2008/36]FI07.06.2006
IE07.06.2006
DK07.09.2006
SE07.09.2006
GR08.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
LU20.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2008/21]FI07.06.2006
IE07.06.2006
DK07.09.2006
SE07.09.2006
GR08.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2008/17]FI07.06.2006
IE07.06.2006
DK07.09.2006
SE07.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2007/22]FI07.06.2006
IE07.06.2006
DK07.09.2006
SE07.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2007/18]FI07.06.2006
IE07.06.2006
SE07.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2007/02]FI07.06.2006
SE07.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
Former [2006/50]SE07.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
Former [2006/49]SE07.09.2006
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE2150572  (SCHOBER WILLI) [X] 1 * page 9, line 5 - line 13 * * page 7, line 9 - line 20 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 2;
 [Y]US2088955  (WILSON HAMILL WILLIAM) [Y] 2 * page 1, column 1, line 24 - line 31 * * page 2, column 1, line 33 - line 37 * * figure 20 *;
 [A]US3283641  (WAGNER JOHN B) [A] 3 * column 2, line 19 - line 60 * * figures 2,6-9 *;
 [A]GB2069087  (STUMPP & KURZ) [A] 4 * page 1, line 95 - line 129 * * figures 1-3 * * page 2, line 63 - line 93 *