Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996087

EP0996087 - Device and method for manufacturing a track, namely a transponder strip [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.05.2007
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.06.2007  [2007/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
bielomatik Leuze GmbH + Co. KG
Daimlerstrasse 6-10
72639 Neuffen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/42]For all designated states
bielomatik Leuze GmbH + Co. KG
Daimlerstrasse 6-10
72639 Neuffen / DE
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
BIELOMATIK LEUZE GmbH + Co.
Daimlerstrasse 6-10
D-72639 Neuffen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bohn, Martin
Lüftestrasse 48
72762 Reutlingen / DE
02 / Scheller, Wolfgang
Seligenstadter Weg 9
97241 Oberpleichfeld / DE
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB
Postfach 10 40 36
70035 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele
Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99120763.020.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateDE199814871622.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19848716
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0996087
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0996087
Date:28.03.2001
[2001/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0996087
Date:28.06.2006
Language:DE
[2006/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP09.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/077, B07C5/344
[2001/13]
Former International [2000/17]G06K19/077
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2001/51]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bearbeitung einer Bahn, insbesondere eines Transponder-Streifens[2000/17]
English:Device and method for manufacturing a track, namely a transponder strip[2000/17]
French:Appareil et procédé de fabrication d'une trace, nottament une bande pour un transpondeur[2000/17]
Examination procedure12.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/45]
29.09.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
31.01.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
10.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.05.2006Fee for grant paid
10.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
10.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
16.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
19.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.11.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
16.11.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0720123  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19632795  (CICOREL S A [CH], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *