blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0997220

EP0997220 - Tool holder for machine tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.05.2000
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2000Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 28.06.2000 [2000/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
System 3R International AB
Sorterargatan 1
162 50 Vällingby / SE
[2000/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Nordquist, Hakon
Visinge Gard
187 75 Täby / SE
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Zinngrebe, Horst
Saalbaustrasse 11
64283 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Zinngrebe, Horst, Dr.rer.nat.
Saalbaustrasse 11
64283 Darmstadt / DE
Application number, filing date99120764.820.10.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateDE199814944527.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19849445
[2000/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0997220
Date:03.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0997220
Date:17.05.2000
[2000/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.04.2000
ClassificationIPC:B23H7/26, B23Q16/08, B23Q16/02
[2000/21]
CPC:
B23H7/26 (EP); B23Q1/0063 (EP)
Former IPC [2000/18]B23H7/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/18]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Werkzeughalter für eine Werkzeugmaschine[2000/18]
English:Tool holder for machine tool[2000/18]
French:Porte-outil pour machine-outil[2000/18]
Examination procedure06.05.2000Application withdrawn by applicant  [2000/26]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP0818270  (CERTA AG) [X] 1-4,11 * column 7, line 37 - line 45 * * figure - * [A] 6,7,9 [Y] 5,8,10;
 [Y]EP0111092  (EROWA AG) [Y] 5,8,10 * page 8, line 4 - line 8 * * page 9, line 3 - line 16 * * figures 2-4 *;
 [A]DE4428310  (SCHANZ MANFRED) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [DA]EP0255042  (3R MANAGEMENT AB) [DA] 1-11
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.