Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996031

EP0996031 - Method and apparatus for disassembling a lens-fitted photo film unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.06.2005
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.06.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.08.2005  [2005/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210, Nakanuma
Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/34]For all designated states
Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa / JP
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210,Nakanuma, Minami-ashigara-shi
Kanagawa / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Aoshima, Shinsuke, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
210 Nakanuma
Minami-ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Morita, Masaya, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
210 Nakanuma
Minami-ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Uchida, Shoichi, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
210 Nakanuma
Minami-ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
04 / Tominaga, Yoshihiro, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
210 Nakanuma
Minami-ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99120795.220.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateJP1998029841020.10.1998         Original published format: JP 29841098
JP1998029841120.10.1998         Original published format: JP 29841198
JP1998030484827.10.1998         Original published format: JP 30484898
JP1998030484927.10.1998         Original published format: JP 30484998
JP1999000506412.01.1999         Original published format: JP 506499
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0996031
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0996031
Date:28.06.2000
[2000/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0996031
Date:18.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP05.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:G03B19/04
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/11]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Gerät zum Zerlegen einer mit Linse versehenen Fotofilmeinheit[2000/17]
English:Method and apparatus for disassembling a lens-fitted photo film unit[2000/17]
French:Procédé et appareil pour le démontage d'une unité de film photo équipée d'une lentille[2000/17]
Examination procedure27.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
29.12.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.04.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
13.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2004Fee for grant paid
15.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04009869.1  / EP1491945
EP05023862.5  / EP1624335
Opposition(s)19.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
31.01.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]JPH06161042  ;
 [A]EP0599230  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7 * abstract *;
 [A]US5452036  (KAMATA KAZUO [JP]) [A] 1,7 * figure 1; claims 1-3 *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940907), vol. 018, no. 481, Database accession no. (P - 1797), [DA] 1,7 * abstract *