blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0997926


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.11.2006 No opposition filed within time limit published on  13.12.2006  [2006/50]
19.11.2005 (Expected) grant published on  04.01.2006  [2006/01]
03.11.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.09.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
09.09.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
20.04.2005 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
03.11.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.11.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.11.2002 Renewal fee
08.11.2001 Renewal fee
08.02.2001 Change - extension states
15.12.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  31.01.2001 [2001/05]
21.07.2000 Request for examination filed published on  06.09.2000 [2000/36]
31.03.2000 Publication of search report published on  17.05.2000 [2000/20]
17.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.05.2000 [2000/18]