blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0997926
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3959906BGlobal Dossier 15.08.2007B2
JP2000200697 18.07.2000A
Priority number Date
JP29595899 18.10.1999
JP30400398 26.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0997926Global Dossier 04.01.2006B1
EP0997926 17.05.2000A3
EP0997926 03.05.2000A2
Priority number Date
JP30400398 26.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1141009C 03.03.2004C
CN1254250 24.05.2000A
Priority number Date
JP30400398 26.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69929271T 21.09.2006T2
DE69929271D 30.03.2006D1
Priority number Date
JP30400398 26.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HK1026329 30.07.2004A1
Priority number Date
JP30400398 26.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100320574B 12.01.2002B1
KR20000029287 25.05.2000A
Priority number Date
JP30400398 26.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW518367B 21.01.2003B
Priority number Date
JP30400398 26.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6424091 23.07.2002B1
Priority number Date
JP30400398 26.10.1998