Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0997926

EP0997926 - Plasma treatment apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2006
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.12.2006  [2006/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD.
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571-8686 / JP
[2006/01]
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd.
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571-8686 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sawada, Yasushi
36-4 Narita-Higashigoaka
Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0002 / JP
02 / Nakamura, Kosuke
24-1-103 Suehiro-cho
Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0009 / JP
03 / Kitamura, Hiroaki
1-14-4-302 Jinai-cho
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-0056 / JP
04 / Inoue, Yoshitami
6-12 Nisshin-cho
Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0028 / JP
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[2000/18]
Application number, filing date99120797.820.10.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateJP1998030400326.10.1998         Original published format: JP 30400398
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0997926
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0997926
Date:17.05.2000
[2000/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0997926
Date:04.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01J37/32
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/05]
Former [2000/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Apparat und Verfahren zur Plasmabehandlung[2000/18]
English:Plasma treatment apparatus and method[2000/18]
French:Appareil et méthode pour le TRAITEMENT AU PLASMA[2000/18]
Examination procedure11.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
25.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.2005Fee for grant paid
31.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
24.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0431951  (JAPAN RES DEV CORP [JP]) [A] 1,14,16 * column 3, lines 5-58; figures 1-3 *;
 [D]JPH04358976  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD);
 [A]US5369336  (KOINUMA HIDEOMI [JP], et al) [A] 1,14,16 * column 3, lines 41-64; figures 1,2 * * abstract *;
 [A]WO9428568  (UNIV TENNESSEE [US]);
 [A]WO9832154  (BALZERS HOCHVAKUUM [LI], et al)