Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995956

EP0995956 - Ice dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.04.2004  [2004/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOSHIZAKI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-16, Minami Yakata, Sakae-machi Toyoake-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/11]For all designated states
Hoshizaki Denki Kabushiki Kaisha
3-16, Minami Yakata, Sakae-machi
Toyoake-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Hoshizaki Denki Kabushiki Kaisha
3-16, Minami Yakata, Sakae-cho
Toyoake-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tsuchikawa, Koji
c/o Hoshizaki Denki K.K., 3-16 Minami Yakata
Sakae-machi, Toyoake-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99120804.221.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateJP1998029979021.10.1998         Original published format: JP 29979098
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995956
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0995956
Date:26.07.2000
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995956
Date:16.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:F25C5/00, F25C1/14
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2001/15]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Eisausgabegerät[2000/17]
English:Ice dispenser[2000/17]
French:Distributeur de glace[2000/17]
Examination procedure17.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
27.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2003Fee for grant paid
07.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US4496087  (MARKS JAMES R [US]) [X] 1 * figure 3; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5230448  (STROHMEYER DARWIN L [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 2; figure 2 *;
 [A]US4846381  (KITO YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 2; figure 2 *;
 [A]US4787539  (UCHIDA NAOYA [JP], et al)
by applicantJPS6127033U