Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0999075

EP0999075 - Wheel mounting [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  01.04.2005
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.2005Refusal of applicationpublished on 18.05.2005  [2005/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Szabo, Laszlo, Dipl.-Ing.
Sudetenring 9
38165 Lehre / DE
[2000/19]
Application number, filing date99120810.921.10.1999
[2000/19]
Priority number, dateDE199815075904.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19850759
[2000/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0999075
Date:10.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0999075
Date:18.06.2003
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:B60B3/16
[2000/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/19]
TitleGerman:Radbefestigung[2000/19]
English:Wheel mounting[2000/19]
French:Fixation d'une roue[2000/19]
Examination procedure18.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/10]
18.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/20]
25.12.2004Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0694420  (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [X] 1,3 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 22; figure - *;
 [A]JPS5836701  ;
 [A]DE4227259  (STAHLSCHMIDT & MAIWORM [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4306484  (STAHLSCHMIDT & MAIWORM [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE2361282  (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [DA]DE7206171U  (BAYRISCHES DRUCKGUSS-WERK) [DA] 1 * figure -; claim - *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830520), vol. 007, no. 116, Database accession no. (M - 216), [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantDE7206171U