Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0982078

EP0982078 - Lockable, hand-held dispenser and mixing tray for dispensing small quantities of material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2004
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/09]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Broyles, Bruce R.
PO Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
02 / Biesecker, James C.
PO Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
03 / Radewald, Vem E.
PO Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
04 / Wilson, James A.
PO Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/09]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99120849.726.06.1996
[2000/09]
Priority number, dateUS1996058981822.01.1996         Original published format: US 589818
US1996065505129.05.1996         Original published format: US 655051
[2000/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0982078
Date:01.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0982078
Date:15.11.2000
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0982078
Date:22.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:B05C17/01
[2000/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/09]
TitleGerman:Verriegelbarer Handspender und Mischplatte zum Spenden von kleinen Materialmengen[2000/09]
English:Lockable, hand-held dispenser and mixing tray for dispensing small quantities of material[2000/09]
French:Distributeur à main verrouillable et bac mélangeur pour distribuer de petites quantités de matériau[2000/09]
Examination procedure04.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/27]
24.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
03.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2003Fee for grant paid
18.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96921788.4  / EP0871547
Opposition(s)23.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]CH669577  (MICRO MEGA SA) [A] 1 * page 3, column L, line 20 - line 32 *
by applicantUS3977574
 US4444560
 US4779770
 US5377823
 US5295827