Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1002504

EP1002504 - Color key [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.02.2011
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 31.10.2012  [2012/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ivoclar Vivadent AG
Bendererstrasse 2
9494 Schaan / LI
[2001/15]
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
IVOCLAR AG
Bendererstrasse 2
9494 Schaan / LI
Inventor(s)01 / Foser, Hans-Peter
Neue Churerstrasse 33
FL 9496 Balzers / LI
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Baronetzky, Klaus , et al
Splanemann
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date99120897.628.10.1999
[2000/21]
Priority number, dateDE199815113405.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19851134
[2000/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1002504
Date:24.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1002504
Date:21.08.2002
[2002/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1002504
Date:14.04.2010
Language:DE
[2010/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61C19/10
[2000/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/21]
TitleGerman:Farbschlüssel[2000/21]
English:Color key[2000/21]
French:Dispositif d'identification de couleur[2000/21]
Examination procedure05.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
16.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.03.2007
13.03.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
21.03.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
27.11.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2010Fee for grant paid
02.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.01.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
08.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
09.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
24.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
29.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
30.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
29.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
IE14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
PT16.08.2010
LU28.10.2010
BE31.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
[2012/44]
Former [2011/40]CY14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
IE14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
PT16.08.2010
BE31.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
Former [2011/25]CY14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
IE14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
PT16.08.2010
MC31.10.2010
Former [2010/45]NL14.04.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]US5588834  (RESK RICHARD E [US], et al) [X] 1,5,12 * column 3, line 1 - line 15; figure 3 *;
 [X]WO9824384  (SCHOON EDUARD PETER GHISLAINE [NL]) [X] 1,3-5 * page 4, line 3 - line 22; figure 3 *;
 [A]US5149267  (LONGHINI ROSS A [US], et al) [A] 1,5,8 * column W *
ExaminationUS5078598
by applicantDE19509830
 DE3429927