Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1000787

EP1000787 - Vehicle refrigerating cycle apparatus and method for inhibiting cycle corrosion and for facilitating rapid passenger compartment warm-up during low temperature conditions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.08.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city
Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
Denso Corporation
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takano, Yoshiaki
c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8661 / JP
02 / Izawa, Satoshi
c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8661 / JP
03 / Yamanaka, Yasushi
c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8661 / JP
04 / Ito, Hajime
c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8661 / JP
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Klingseisen, Franz , et al
Klingseisen, Rings & Partner
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 15 61
80089 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Klingseisen, Franz , et al
Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61
80089 München / DE
Former [2000/20]Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Postfach 10 15 61
80089 München / DE
Application number, filing date99120937.002.11.1999
[2000/20]
Priority number, dateJP1998031786009.11.1998         Original published format: JP 31786098
[2000/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1000787
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1000787
Date:19.06.2002
[2002/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1000787
Date:08.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:B60H1/32, B60H1/00, F25B41/04
[2002/25]
Former International [2000/20]B60H1/32
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/11]
Former [2000/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wärmepumpenartige Klimaanlage für ein Fahrzeug und Verfahren zur Korrosionsinhibierung und zum Erleichtern von Schnellerwärmung eines Fahrgastraumes während niedriger Temperaturen[2000/20]
English:Vehicle refrigerating cycle apparatus and method for inhibiting cycle corrosion and for facilitating rapid passenger compartment warm-up during low temperature conditions[2000/20]
French:Appareil de climatisation du type pompe à chaleur pour véhicule et procédé d'inhibition de la corrosion et pour faciliter le chauffage rapide de l'habitacle pendant de basses températures[2000/20]
Examination procedure01.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/41]
02.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2003Fee for grant paid
06.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[YA]US5291941  (ENOMOTO MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 6-9 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 42; figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 1-5,10-19;
 [YA]US5201189  (YOKOMACHI NAOYA [US], et al) [Y] 6-9 * figure 6; claim 1 * [A] 1-5,10-19;
 [A]DE4337349  (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1-19 * column 32, lines 15-51; figure 31; claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH1076841  ;
 [A]US2363273  (WATERFILL ROBERT W) [A] 1-19 * column W *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 08, [A] 1-19 * abstract *
by applicantJPH05223357