Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1003103

EP1003103 - Write anywhere file-system layout method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/21]Write anywhere file-system layout
[2008/20]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.08.2009
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR, LU
published on 20.07.2011  [2011/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Network Appliance, Inc.
495 East Java Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
[2008/23]
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
Network Appliance, Inc.
495 East Java Avenue
Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hitz, David
245 Old Spanish Trail
Portola Valley, California 94028 / US
02 / Malcom, Michael
21210 Chadwick Court
Saratoga, California 95070 / US
03 / Lau, James
11570 Upland Way
Cupertino, California 94043 / US
04 / Rakitzis, Byron
100 North Whisman Nr.130
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
 [2009/05]
Former [2000/29]01 / Hitz, David
245 Old Spanish Trail
Portola Valley, California 94028 / US
02 / Malcolm, Michael
21210 Chadwick Court
Saratoga, California 95070 / US
03 / Lau, James
11570 Upland Way
Cupertino, California 94043 / US
04 / Rakitzis, Byron
100 North Whisman Nr.130
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
Former [2000/21]01 / Hitz, David
925 Wolfe Road Nr.23
Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US
02 / Malcom, Michael
48 South Avalon Drive
Los Altos, California 94022 / US
03 / Lau, James
11570 Upland Way
Cupertino, California 94043 / US
04 / Rakitzis, Byron
100 North Whisman Nr.130
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
Representative(s)Leeming, John Gerard
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]Leeming, John Gerard
J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date99120949.502.06.1994
[2000/21]
Priority number, dateUS1993007164303.06.1993         Original published format: US 71643
[2000/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1003103
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1003103
Date:15.08.2007
[2007/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1003103
Date:01.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.07.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/14
[2000/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/21]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Beschreiben beliebiger Bereiche eines Dateisystems[2008/20]
English:Write anywhere file-system layout method and apparatus[2008/20]
French:Méthode et dispositif décriture d'un système de fichiers dans une zone non prédéterminée[2008/20]
Former [2000/21]Anordnung eines Dateisystems zum Beschreiben beliebiger Bereiche
Former [2000/21]Write anywhere file-system layout
Former [2000/21]Dispositif d'un système de fichiers à écriture dans une zone non prédéterminée
Examination procedure12.10.2007Examination requested  [2007/48]
22.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2008Fee for grant paid
13.08.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94921242.7  / EP0702815
Opposition(s)02.07.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
03.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
03.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
03.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 11
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 12
14.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 13
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 14
25.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 15
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.10.2008
BE01.10.2008
DK01.10.2008
IT01.10.2008
SE01.01.2009
GR02.01.2009
ES12.01.2009
PT02.03.2009
IE02.06.2009
LU02.06.2009
CH30.06.2009
LI30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
[2011/25]
Former [2010/28]AT01.10.2008
BE01.10.2008
DK01.10.2008
IT01.10.2008
SE01.01.2009
ES12.01.2009
PT02.03.2009
IE02.06.2009
CH30.06.2009
LI30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2010/06]AT01.10.2008
BE01.10.2008
DK01.10.2008
IT01.10.2008
SE01.01.2009
ES12.01.2009
PT02.03.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2009/32]AT01.10.2008
BE01.10.2008
ES12.01.2009
PT02.03.2009
Former [2009/30]AT01.10.2008
ES12.01.2009
PT02.03.2009
Former [2009/20]ES12.01.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0466389  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * column 4, line 35 - column 6, line 48 *;
 [A]US4814971  (THATTE SATISH M [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * column 6, lines 39-51 *;
 [A]EP0453193  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 31 *
 [XA]  B SRINIVASAN ET AL., "Recoverable file system for microprocessor systems", MICROPROCESSORS AND MICROSYSTEMS., LONDON GB, (198505), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 179 - 183, XP002031805 [X] 1,6,19,22 * page 180, column L, line 15 - page 182, column R, line 30 * [A] 2-5,7-18,20,21

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0141-9331(85)90004-3