Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0999361

EP0999361 - Device with junction of drilled holes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.01.2008
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 04.06.2008  [2008/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Klesse, Christoph
Zum Aichahof 7
93186 Pettendorf / DE
02 / Krüger, Hinrich
Dr-Leo-Ritter-Strasse 61
93049 Regensburg / DE
03 / Taudt, Christian
Tegernheimer-Keller-Strasse 19
93105 Tegernheim / DE
04 / Werner, Martin
Thonlohe 29
93155 Hemau / DE
05 / Zander, Eckbert
Ellernstrasse 17
06507 Bad Suderode / DE
[2000/19]
Application number, filing date99121000.605.11.1999
[2000/19]
Priority number, dateDE199815128606.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19851286
[2000/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0999361
Date:10.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0999361
Date:10.12.2003
[2003/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0999361
Date:21.03.2007
Language:DE
[2007/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:F02M55/02, F02M59/44, C21D7/02, F16L41/02
[2003/50]
Former International [2000/19]F02M55/02, F02M59/44, C21D7/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/36]
Former [2000/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung mit Bohrungsverschneidung[2000/19]
English:Device with junction of drilled holes[2000/19]
French:Dispositif avec jonction de perçages[2000/19]
Examination procedure19.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/13]
08.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2007Fee for grant paid
05.02.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06018655.8  / EP1731750
Opposition(s)27.12.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
18.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
21.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
20.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB21.03.2007
IT21.03.2007
[2008/23]
Former [2008/17]GB21.03.2007
Documents cited:Search[XD]DE19808807  (USUI KOKUSAI SANGYO KK [JP]) [XD] 1,3-6,8,9 * column 1, line 3 - line 53; figure 11 * * column 4, line 30 - line 62; figures 1,2 * * column 7, line 63 - column 8, line 17 *;
 [A]GB2296039  (PERKINS LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [PA]DE19802476  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [PA] 1,2,10 * abstract *