Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0998079

EP0998079 - Method for providing a wireless network and a base station for such a network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2008
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, LU
published on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aastra DeTeWe GmbH
Zeughofstrasse 1
10997 Berlin / DE
[2007/15]
Former [2007/07]For all designated states
DeTeWe Systems GmbH
Zeughofstrasse 1
10997 Berlin / DE
Former [2002/24]For all designated states
Dosch & Amand FreeHome GmbH & Co. KG
Scheinerstrasse 9
81679 München / DE
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
Dosch & Amand GmbH & Co. KG
Scheinerstrasse 9
81679 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dosch, Franz A.
Hochplattenstrasse 12
83026 Rosenheim / DE
[2000/18]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2006/20]
Former [2000/18]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99121004.820.10.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateDE199815017330.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19850173
[2000/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0998079
Date:03.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0998079
Date:12.02.2003
[2003/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0998079
Date:11.04.2007
Language:DE
[2007/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28, H04L12/56, H04Q7/32, H04L29/06
[2003/07]
Former International [2000/18]H04L12/28, H04L12/56, H04Q7/32
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/18]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Bereitstellen eines drahtlosen Netzwerkes sowie einer Basisstation für ein derartiges Netz[2000/18]
English:Method for providing a wireless network and a base station for such a network[2000/18]
French:Méthode pour fournir un réseau sans fil et une station de base pour un tel réseau[2000/18]
Examination procedure02.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/22]
30.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
17.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
19.10.2005Fee for grant paid
19.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.01.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/12]
Request for further processing for:19.10.2005Request for further processing filed
19.10.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.02.2007Decision despatched
07.10.2004Request for further processing filed
07.10.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.10.2004Decision despatched
17.02.2004Request for further processing filed
17.02.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.03.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200204   M06   Fee paid on   02.04.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY11.04.2007
DK11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
IE11.04.2007
IT11.04.2007
NL11.04.2007
SE11.07.2007
GR12.07.2007
ES22.07.2007
PT11.09.2007
AT20.10.2007
LU20.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
MC31.10.2007
[2010/06]
Former [2009/15]DK11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
IE11.04.2007
IT11.04.2007
NL11.04.2007
SE11.07.2007
GR12.07.2007
ES22.07.2007
PT11.09.2007
AT20.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
MC31.10.2007
Former [2008/43]DK11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
IE11.04.2007
IT11.04.2007
NL11.04.2007
SE11.07.2007
GR12.07.2007
ES22.07.2007
PT11.09.2007
BE31.10.2007
MC31.10.2007
Former [2008/26]DK11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
IE11.04.2007
IT11.04.2007
NL11.04.2007
SE11.07.2007
GR12.07.2007
ES22.07.2007
PT11.09.2007
MC31.10.2007
Former [2008/23]DK11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
IE11.04.2007
IT11.04.2007
NL11.04.2007
SE11.07.2007
GR12.07.2007
ES22.07.2007
PT11.09.2007
Former [2008/21]DK11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
IE11.04.2007
NL11.04.2007
SE11.07.2007
GR12.07.2007
ES22.07.2007
PT11.09.2007
Former [2008/17]DK11.04.2007
FI11.04.2007
IE11.04.2007
NL11.04.2007
SE11.07.2007
ES22.07.2007
PT11.09.2007
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9817032  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [Y] 1-21 * page 4, line 24 - line 28 * * page 5, line 5 - line 15 * * page 7, line 5 - line 21 * * page 8, line 31 - page 9, line 11 * * page 9, line 25 - page 10, line 13 * * page 16, line 7 - line 11 * * figures 1-10 *;
 [Y]US5412654  (PERKINS CHARLES E [US]) [Y] 1-21 * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 40 *;
 [A]US5654958  (NATARAJAN KADATHUR S [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 12 *;
 [Y]  TOH C-K, "ASSOCIATIVITY-BASED ROUTING FOR AD-HOC MOBILE NETWORKS", WIRELESS PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, NL, (19970301), vol. 4, no. 2, ISSN 0929-6212, pages 103 - 139, XP000728588 [Y] 12 * page 106, line 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1008812928561
 [A]  PIEMONT C, "GEISTREICHE VERBINDUNGEN INTELLIGENTE GERAETE IN DEZENTRALEN NETZEN", CT MAGAZIN FUER COMPUTER TECHNIK, VERLAG HEINZ HEISE GMBH., HANNOVER, DE, (1998), no. 20, ISSN 0724-8679, pages 198 - 202, XP001106236 [A] * the whole document *