Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975174

EP0975174 - Signal transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.07.2004
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Oshima, Mitsuaki
115-3 Katsura, Minamitatsumi-cho, Nishikyo-ku
Kyoto-fu 615 / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date99121026.126.03.1992
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateJP1991006279827.03.1991         Original published format: JP 6279891
JP1991009581325.04.1991         Original published format: JP 9581391
JP1991015565029.05.1991         Original published format: JP 15565091
JP1991018223623.07.1991         Original published format: JP 18223691
JP1992006073917.03.1992         Original published format: JP 6073992
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975174
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975174
Date:27.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/24, H04N7/04, H04N7/08, H04N7/12, H04L27/34
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/41]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Signalübertragungssystem[2000/04]
English:Signal transmission system[2000/04]
French:Système de transmission de signal[2000/04]
Examination procedure21.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
21.10.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
12.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2003Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
23.06.2003Fee for grant paid
23.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP92302627.2  / EP0506400
EP96119060.0  / EP0766478
Opposition(s)28.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
21.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
21.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
21.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 10
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 11
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR27.08.2003
NL27.08.2003
DE28.11.2003
[2006/14]
Former [2004/31]NL27.08.2003
DE28.11.2003
Former [2004/13]NL27.08.2003
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0485105  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH) [E] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US4937844  (KAO MING-LUH) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 68 *;
 [Y]US4525846  (BREMER GORDON ET AL) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4630287  (ARMSTRONG THOMAS) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0365431  (THOMSON CSF) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 16, line 22 - line 39 *;
 [A]US4903125  (PARKER MICHAEL A) [A] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [A]US4891806  (FARIAS LUIS V ET AL);
 [A]US4227152  (GODARD DOMINIQUE N ET AL);
 [A]US4751478  (YOSHIDA YASUHARU);
 [A]EP0392538  (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO)
 [A]  - HILL T ET AL, "A PERFORMANCE STUDY OF NLA 64-STATE QAM", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (198306), vol. COM-31, no. 6, ISSN 0090-6778, page 821-826, XP000758653 [A] 1-6 * paragraph I-III; figures 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOM.1983.1095894