Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972751

EP0972751 - Coating for tools in contact with hot glass [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 27.10.2004  [2004/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
N.V. BEKAERT S.A.
Bekaertstraat 2
8550 Zwevegem / BE
[2000/13]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
SAINT-GOBAIN VITRAGE
18, avenue d'Alsace
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Frebourg Philippe
Hermannstrasse 4
52062 Aachen / DE
02 / Gy, René
6, rue Arthur Rimbaud
93140 Bondy / FR
03 / Keddad, Yasmin
58, route de l'Empereur
92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR
[2000/20]
Former [2000/03]01 / Frebourg Philippe
2bis, rue du Général Schmite
95300 Pontoise / FR
02 / Gy, René
6, rue Arthur Rimbaud
93140 Bondy / FR
03 / Keddad, Yasmin
58, route de l'Empereur
92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2000/13]
Former [2000/03]Renous Chan, Véronique , et al
Saint-Gobain Recherche, 39, Quai Lucien Lefranc
F-93300 Aubervilliers / FR
Application number, filing date99121032.903.10.1996
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateFR1995001171105.10.1995         Original published format: FR 9511711
[2000/03]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972751
Date:19.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972751
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972751
Date:25.06.2003
Language:FR
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C03B23/023, C03B27/004, C03B27/04, C03B40/00, C03B35/20, D03D15/12, D04B1/00, C03B23/03
[2000/15]
Former International [2000/03]C03B23/023, C03B27/004, C03B27/04, C03B40/00, C03B35/20, D03D15/12, D04B1/00
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   PT [2000/03]
TitleGerman:Bekleidung für in Kontakt mit heissem Glas stehende Werkzeuge[2000/03]
English:Coating for tools in contact with hot glass[2000/03]
French:Revetement pour outillages en contact avec du verre chaud[2000/03]
Examination procedure03.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/18]
13.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.2003Fee for grant paid
29.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96402109.1  / EP0767146
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
20.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI25.06.2003
GB25.06.2003
PT25.09.2003
CH31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
[2004/44]
Former [2004/22]FI25.06.2003
GB25.06.2003
PT25.09.2003
Former [2004/13]FI25.06.2003
PT25.09.2003
Former [2004/05]FI25.06.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0319298  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0477785  (NIPPON SEISEN CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9401372  (BEKAERT SA NV [BE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0312439  (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9401373  (BEKAERT SA NV [BE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *