Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1021952

EP1021952 - Cleaner for inside of water tank [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.05.2004
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Suiken Co., Ltd.
29-1, Hon Isshiki 3-chome, Edogawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/30]
Inventor(s)01 / Ogawa, Soichi
20-14, Nishikoiwa 2-chome, Edogawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Prechtel, Jörg , et al
c/o Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Richard-Strauss-Straße 80
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date99121072.521.10.1999
[2000/30]
Priority number, dateJP1999001217220.01.1999         Original published format: JP 1217299
[2000/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1021952
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1021952
Date:10.01.2001
[2001/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1021952
Date:16.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01K61/00
[2000/30]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/39]
Former [2000/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Reinigungsgerät zum reinigen innerhalb eines wassertanks[2000/30]
English:Cleaner for inside of water tank[2000/30]
French:Appareil de nettoyage pour l'Intérieur d'un réservoir d'eau[2000/30]
Examination procedure18.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/33]
20.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.05.2003Fee for grant paid
06.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US3734853  (HORVATH T) [X] 1 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 24; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0527580  (CHESCO INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *