blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1002755

EP1002755 - Device for separating sheet piles from a transfer line [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.02.2005
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, LU
published on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E.C.H. Will GmbH
Nedderfeld 100
D-22529 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
E.C.H. WILL GmbH
Nedderfeld 100
D-22529 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Wolf, Wolfram
Dorfstrasse 1
25485 Bilsen / DE
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Ballindamm 3
20095 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date99121101.222.10.1999
[2000/21]
Priority number, dateDE199815178010.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19851780
[2000/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1002755
Date:24.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1002755
Date:29.08.2001
[2001/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1002755
Date:14.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.07.2001
ClassificationIPC:B65H29/58, B65H33/16, B65G47/82, B65G51/03, B65H31/30
[2001/31]
CPC:
B65H31/3081 (EP,US); B65G51/03 (EP,US); B65H29/58 (EP,US);
B65H33/16 (EP,US); B65H2301/4224 (EP,US); B65H2301/42264 (EP,US);
B65H2301/42266 (EP,US); B65H2404/2321 (EP,US); B65H2404/73 (EP,US);
B65H2405/52 (EP,US); B65H2406/11 (EP,US); B65H2701/176 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2001/05]B65H29/58, B65H33/16, B65G47/82
Former IPC [2000/21]B65H29/58
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/21]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Ausschleusen von Blattlagen aus einer Förderlinie[2000/21]
English:Device for separating sheet piles from a transfer line[2000/21]
French:Dispositif pour séparer des cahiers de feullies d'une ligne de transport[2000/21]
Examination procedure28.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/19]
18.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2004Fee for grant paid
09.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY14.04.2004
IE14.04.2004
NL14.04.2004
DK14.07.2004
GR14.07.2004
SE14.07.2004
LU22.10.2004
BE31.10.2004
CH31.10.2004
LI31.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
[2007/18]
Former [2006/12]IE14.04.2004
NL14.04.2004
DK14.07.2004
GR14.07.2004
SE14.07.2004
BE31.10.2004
CH31.10.2004
LI31.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/51]IE14.04.2004
DK14.07.2004
GR14.07.2004
SE14.07.2004
BE31.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/45]IE14.04.2004
DK14.07.2004
GR14.07.2004
SE14.07.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/19]IE14.04.2004
DK14.07.2004
GR14.07.2004
SE14.07.2004
Former [2005/18]DK14.07.2004
GR14.07.2004
SE14.07.2004
Former [2005/06]GR14.07.2004
SE14.07.2004
Former [2004/52]SE14.07.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2063304  (FOERDERTECHNISCHE FORSCHUNGSGE) [X] 31* page 8, paragraph 2 - page 9 *;
 [DA]US3822777  (JEPSEN J) [DA] 23-25 * the whole document *;
 [X]GB2134891  (WILL E C H) [X] 31,32 * page 3, line 90 - page 4, line 51 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US4589812  (MEIVES OTIS E [US], et al) [X] 31-33,35 * column 2, line 28 - line 49 * * column 4, line 4 - line 68 * * column 5, line 61 - line 65 * * column 6, line 23 - line 31 * * figures 1-3,6 *;
 [X]EP0252752  (SUPER X LTD [GB]) [X] 23 * column 2, line 41 - line 43 * * column 5, line 24 - line 27 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]EP0327858  (MINDA INDUSTRIEANLAGEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,15,26 * column 3, line 1 - line 12 * * column 3, line 30 - line 36 *;
 [A]US5660095  (SMITTERBERG DEAN W [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 8 * * column 10, line 48 - line 52 * * column 12, line 31 - line 35 * * column 13, line 22 - line 25 * * figures 4,12,13 *;
 [PA]DE19731656  (CENTRO KONTROLLSYSTEME [DE]) [PA] 1-9,15,26 * page 2, line 1 - line 19 * * page 3, line 43 - line 47 * * page 3, line 59 - page 4, line 11 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [PX]DE19743423  (WILL E C H GMBH & CO [DE]) [PX] 1 * column 2, line 38 - line 42 * * column 2, line 62 - line 66 * * column 3, line 24 *
by applicantUS3822777
 DE2708131
 DE3122632
 DE2449620
 DE3403215
 DE4415047
 DE4421325
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.