Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996178

EP0996178 - Nonaqueous electrolyte battery [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2004
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.03.2004  [2004/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/11]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hara, Tomitaro
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Hatazawa, Tsuyonobu
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Hatsuta, Kazuhito
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte
Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date99121173.122.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateJP1998030308423.10.1998         Original published format: JP 30308498
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0996178
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0996178
Date:12.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01M2/02, H01M4/66
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/02]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Batterie mit nichtwässerigem Elektrolyt[2000/17]
English:Nonaqueous electrolyte battery[2000/17]
French:Batterie à électrolyte non-aqueux[2000/17]
Examination procedure29.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
20.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2002Fee for grant paid
13.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0862227  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4-8 * column 2, line 14 - line 27 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 6 * * column 4, line 42 - line 55 * * column 7, line 1 - line 5 * * column 8, line 13 - line 20 * * example 4 * [A] 3;
 [XA]EP0852404  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1,4,6-8 * page 2, line 33 - line 38 * * page 3, line 21 - line 24 * * example 1 * * table 1 * [A] 3;
 [X]EP0397248  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1,4,6,8 * page 2, line 6 - line 15 * * page 2, line 31 - line 49 * * page 3, line 24 - line 51 *;
 [X]EP0390557  (MHB JOINT VENTURE [US]) [X] 1,4-6,8 * column 2, line 36 - line 54 * * column 4, line 19 - line 32 * * column 4, line 46 - line 50 * * column 5, line 27 - line 39 * * column 6, line 33 - line 36 * * column 9, line 4 - line 18 * * column 11, line 9 - line 25 *