blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0997696 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP04101201 EP99121287



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1435499Global Dossier 07.07.2004A2
Priority number Date
EP99121287 26.10.1999
DE19850303 30.10.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59911725D 14.04.2005D1
Priority number Date
DE19850303 30.10.1998
DE59911725 26.10.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0997696Global Dossier 09.03.2005B1
EP0997696 05.12.2001A3
EP0997696 03.05.2000A2
Priority number Date
DE19850303 30.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT290678T 15.03.2005T
Priority number Date
DE19850303 30.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19850303 04.05.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19850303 30.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6199294 13.03.2001B1
Priority number Date
DE19850303 30.10.1998
TypeType Divisional application
 EP1435499