Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0997696

EP0997696 - Apparatus for drying bulk materials [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.01.2006
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MANN + HUMMEL ProTec GmbH
Grönerstrasse 44-50
71636 Ludwigsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
Mann + Hummel ProTec GmbH
Grönerstrasse 44-50
71636 Ludwigsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Becker, Achim
Alicienstrasse 19a
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Voth, Gerhard
Mann+Hummel GmbH
Hindenburgstrasse 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Voth, Gerhard
Mann+Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
Former [2000/18]Voth, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing.
FILTERWERK MANN + HUMMEL GMBH Postfach 4 09
71631 Ludwigsburg / DE
Application number, filing date99121287.926.10.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateDE199815030330.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19850303
[2000/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0997696
Date:03.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0997696
Date:05.12.2001
[2001/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0997696
Date:09.03.2005
Language:DE
[2005/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:F26B9/06, F26B21/08, B65D88/28
[2001/37]
Former International [2000/18]F26B9/06, F26B21/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/18]
TitleGerman:Trockenvorrichtung für Schüttgüter[2000/18]
English:Apparatus for drying bulk materials[2000/18]
French:Dispositif de séchage pour des produits en vrac[2000/18]
Examination procedure01.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/16]
24.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.2004Fee for grant paid
09.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
14.01.2005Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
21.01.2005Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted
Divisional application(s)EP04101201.4  / EP1435499
Opposition(s)12.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI09.03.2005
IE09.03.2005
NL09.03.2005
DK09.06.2005
GR09.06.2005
SE09.06.2005
ES20.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
AT26.10.2005
CY26.10.2005
BE31.10.2005
CH31.10.2005
LI31.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
[2008/17]
Former [2007/23]FI09.03.2005
IE09.03.2005
NL09.03.2005
DK09.06.2005
GR09.06.2005
ES20.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
AT26.10.2005
CY26.10.2005
BE31.10.2005
CH31.10.2005
LI31.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
Former [2007/21]FI09.03.2005
IE09.03.2005
NL09.03.2005
DK09.06.2005
GR09.06.2005
ES20.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
CY26.10.2005
BE31.10.2005
CH31.10.2005
LI31.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
Former [2007/18]FI09.03.2005
IE09.03.2005
NL09.03.2005
DK09.06.2005
GR09.06.2005
ES20.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
BE31.10.2005
CH31.10.2005
LI31.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
Former [2006/42]FI09.03.2005
IE09.03.2005
NL09.03.2005
DK09.06.2005
GR09.06.2005
ES20.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
CH31.10.2005
LI31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
Former [2006/30]FI09.03.2005
IE09.03.2005
NL09.03.2005
DK09.06.2005
GR09.06.2005
ES20.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
MC31.10.2005
Former [2006/14]FI09.03.2005
IE09.03.2005
NL09.03.2005
DK09.06.2005
GR09.06.2005
ES20.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
Former [2006/13]FI09.03.2005
IE09.03.2005
DK09.06.2005
Former [2005/46]FI09.03.2005
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE3234431  (GRAEFF RODERICH WILHELM) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2449054  (PRUNET ACHILLE) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE1106251  (ELBA WERK MASCHINEN GMBH & CO, et al) [A] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2757527  (SCHWAEBISCHE HUETTENWERKE GMBH) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2560141  (TIPPS JAMES F) [A] 1,7 * column W *;
 [A]US4159580  (WELCH JR RICHARD) [A] 1,7 * column W *;
 [A]US4412392  (KELLER RICHARD L [US]) [A] 1,7 * column W *;
 [A]DE1531920  (EISGRUBER KARL HEINRICH);
 [A]DE4334758  (BIBOX MEHRWEG VERPACKUNGSSYST [DE]);
 [A]DE3143922  (TAKRAF SCHWERMASCH [DD])
by applicantDE3234431
 DE19633177