Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1004444

EP1004444 - Liquid jet recording head and assembling method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/11]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takahashi, Wataru
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Inaba, Masaki
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Hosaka, Ken
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Fukai, Hisashi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
05 / Ishimatsu, Shin
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
06 / Inoue, Ryoji
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
07 / Fukui, Shigeki
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
08 / Sato, Yohei
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
09 / Yoshihara, Yoshihiko
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/22]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/33]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/22]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99121293.726.10.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateJP1998032145027.10.1998         Original published format: JP 32145098
JP1999030327226.10.1999         Original published format: JP 30327299
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1004444
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1004444
Date:03.04.2002
[2002/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1004444
Date:22.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/16, B41J2/14
[2002/14]
Former International [2000/22]B41J2/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2003/01]
Former [2000/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Flüssigkeitsstrahlaufzeichnungskopf und Verfahren zu dessen Zusammenbau[2000/22]
English:Liquid jet recording head and assembling method therefor[2000/22]
French:Tête d'enregistrement par jet de liquide et sa méthode d'assemblage[2000/22]
Examination procedure14.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/42]
02.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2006Fee for grant paid
12.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR22.03.2006
IT22.03.2006
NL22.03.2006
ES03.07.2006
GB26.10.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2008/17]IT22.03.2006
NL22.03.2006
ES03.07.2006
GB26.10.2006
Former [2006/50]NL22.03.2006
ES03.07.2006
Former [2006/45]NL22.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0694397  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,11 * column 5, line 54 - column 8, line 48 * * figures 12,13 *;
 [A]EP0670220  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,4-8,10-17 * column 10, line 38 - column 12, line 50 * * figures 12-17 *;
 [A]JPH10264398  ;
 [A]EP0849084  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0829358  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,11 * column 8, line 55 - column 9, line 29 * * figures 11-13 *;
 [A]US5373633  (SATOI TSUNENOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 16, line 31 - column 17, line 59 * * figures 17-22 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, [A] 1,4-17 * abstract *
by applicantJPH04171130
 JPH04171126
 JPH04171163
 JPH054136