blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1004444 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1004444



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 308
26.01.2007 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.02.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.01.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.01.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
10.01.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
10.01.2006 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
10.01.2006 Translation of priority document Search / examination 58
10.01.2006 Translation of priority document Search / examination 76
05.09.2005 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
02.09.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
02.09.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.09.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 60
05.07.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
21.06.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 3
08.04.2002 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
14.02.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
14.02.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.02.2002 European search report Search / examination 1
01.02.2002 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
19.04.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
26.10.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.10.1999 Claims Search / examination 7
26.10.1999 Description Search / examination 43
26.10.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
26.10.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.10.1999 Drawings Search / examination 12
26.10.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
26.10.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6