blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1004444


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.11.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.12.2008  [2009/01]
25.04.2008 Change - representative published on  28.05.2008  [2008/22]
21.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.04.2008  [2008/17]
30.03.2007 No opposition filed within time limit published on  02.05.2007  [2007/18]
10.11.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2006  [2006/50]
06.10.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2006  [2006/45]
03.02.2006 (Expected) grant published on  22.03.2006  [2006/12]
27.01.2006 Change - applicant published on  15.03.2006  [2006/11]
24.01.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
24.01.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
10.11.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.08.2005 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.07.2005 Change - representative published on  17.08.2005  [2005/33]
09.11.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.11.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.03.2003 Change - extension states
15.11.2002 Definitive list of designations published on  02.01.2003  [2003/01]
08.11.2002 Renewal fee
30.08.2002 Request for examination filed published on  16.10.2002  [2002/42]
15.02.2002 Publication of search report published on  03.04.2002  [2002/14]
15.02.2002 Change - classification published on  03.04.2002  [2002/14]
12.11.2001 Renewal fee
14.04.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  31.05.2000 [2000/22]