Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0997693

EP0997693 - Method for integrating a blast furnace and a direct reduction reactor using cryogenic rectification [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.03.2004
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.04.2004  [2004/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY, INC.
39 Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury, CT 06810-5113 / US
[2000/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Shah, Minish Mahendra
84 S. Castlerock Lane
East Amherst, New York 14051 / US
02 / Drnevich, Raymond Francis
5850 Creekview Drive
Clarence Center, New York 14032 / US
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Schwan, Gerhard , et al
Schwan Schwan Schorer
Patentanwälte
Bauerstrasse 22
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Schwan Möbus Wiese, Elfenstrasse 32
81739 München / DE
Application number, filing date99121349.726.10.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateUS1998018147328.10.1998         Original published format: US 181473
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0997693
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0997693
Date:04.10.2000
[2000/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0997693
Date:07.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:F25J3/04, F25J3/02, C21B13/00
[2000/40]
Former International [2000/18]F25J3/04, F25J3/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/25]
Former [2000/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren für integrierten Hochofen und Direktreduktionsreaktor und kryogenische Rektifikation[2000/18]
English:Method for integrating a blast furnace and a direct reduction reactor using cryogenic rectification[2000/18]
French:Procédé intégrant par rectfication cryogénique, un haut-fourneau et un réacteur à réduction directe[2000/18]
Examination procedure18.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
06.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2003Fee for grant paid
06.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4363654  (FREDERICK GEOFFREY, et al) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 50; figures 1,3 * * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 5 *;
 [Y]US5244489  (GRENIER MAURICE [FR]) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * column 1, line 7 - line 20; figure 1 * * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 5 * * column 2, line 18 - line 52 *;
 [A]US5582036  (DRNEVICH RAYMOND F [US], et al) [A] 1,4,5 * column 2, line 9 - line 38; figure 1 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 1 * * column 3, line 32 - line 54 * * column 4, line 28 - line 37 *;
 [A]GB2266344  (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]) [A] 1-3 * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 5; figure 1 * * page 5, paragraphs 1-4 * * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 10, paragraph 4 *;
 [A]US5538534  (GUILLARD ALAIN [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 7 - line 12; figure 1 * * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 23 *