Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0997448

EP0997448 - Large size low-expansion ceramic plate and setter, and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.08.2002
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.09.2002  [2002/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NICHIAS CORPORATION
1-26, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
NICHIAS CORPORATION
1-26, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamamoto, Mitsuo
c/o Nichias Corporation, Hamamatsu 1-8-1
Shinmiyakoda, Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka / JP
02 / Sakamoto, Kouji
c/o Nichias Corporation, Hamamatsu 1-8-1
Shinmiyakoda, Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka / JP
03 / Kodaka, Koujirou
c/o Nichias Corporation, Hamamatsu 1-8-1
Shinmiyakoda, Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka / JP
04 / Yoshimoto, Toshihiro
c/o Nichias Corporation, Hamamatsu 1-8-1
Shinmiyakoda, Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka / JP
05 / Kayama, Masaaki
c/o Nichias Corporation, Hamamatsu 1-8-1
Shinmiyakoda, Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka / JP
06 / Shimazaki, Masatoshi
c/o Nichias Corporation, Hamamatsu 1-8-1
Shinmiyakoda, Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka / JP
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99121350.526.10.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateJP1998030505527.10.1998         Original published format: JP 30505598
JP1999001742726.01.1999         Original published format: JP 1742799
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0997448
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0997448
Date:12.07.2000
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/19
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2001/13]
Former [2000/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Grossformatige keramische Platte und Träger mit niedriger Ausdehung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung[2000/18]
English:Large size low-expansion ceramic plate and setter, and process for producing the same[2000/18]
French:Plaque céramique et support de grande dimension et de faible expansion et son procédé de fabrication[2000/18]
Examination procedure08.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
11.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.03.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/39]
25.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XAY]GB1302460  (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [X] 8,11,12 * page 1, line 74 - page 2, line 11 * * page 2, line 33 - line 44 * * page 2, line 94 - line 116 * * page 2, line 129 - page 3, line 5 * * table 1 * * claims 1-4 * [A] 1,14,16 [Y] 2;
 [XY]JPS56109869  ;
 [Y]US4194917  (MORISHITA TOMOHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - line 11 * * column 2, line 28 - line 31 * * column 2, line 40 - line 46 * * column 3, line 60 - line 68 * * table 1 *;
 [X]EP0853072  (CORNING INC [US]) [X] 3-5 * abstract * * page 2, line 48 - line 52 * * page 3, line 2 - line 3 * * page 3, line 7 - line 22 * * page 4, line 5 - line 9 * * page 4, line 16 - line 24 * * page 4, line 33 - line 37 * * example 1 * * table 2 * * claims 1,2,7,10,12 *;
 [AD]JPH0930860  ;
 [A]JPH07247179
 [XY]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1981, no. 41, Database accession no. 1981-74989D, XP002137991 & JPS56109869 A 19810831 (NARUMI SEITO KK) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09030860 A 19970204 (NORITAKE CO LTD) [AD] 14-16 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960131), vol. 1996, no. 01, & JP07247179 A 19950926 (OSAMU YAMAMOTO;OTHERS: 02) [A] 8-10 * abstract *