Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974466

EP0974466 - Ink jet recording head and method of producing same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.01.2004
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.03.2004  [2004/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Miyata, Yoshinao
c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP
02 / Nishiwaki, Tsutomu
c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Diehl, Hermann O. Th. , et al
Diehl & Partner GbR
Augustenstrasse 46
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Diehl, Hermann, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. , et al
DIEHL, GLÄSER, HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date99121357.019.04.1996
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateJP1995009401719.04.1995         Original published format: JP 9401795
JP1995009401919.04.1995         Original published format: JP 9401995
JP1995032085808.12.1995         Original published format: JP 32085895
JP1995032265612.12.1995         Original published format: JP 32265695
JP1995032265712.12.1995         Original published format: JP 32265795
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974466
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974466
Date:26.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/16, B41J2/14
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2002/45]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungskopf und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[2000/04]
English:Ink jet recording head and method of producing same[2000/04]
French:Tête d'enregistrement à jet d'encre et procédé de sa production[2000/04]
Examination procedure26.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
17.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
27.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2003Fee for grant paid
23.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96106204.9  / EP0738599
Opposition(s)30.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
29.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH26.03.2003
LI26.03.2003
NL26.03.2003
SE26.06.2003
[2004/02]
Former [2003/50]SE26.06.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]US5265315  (HOISINGTON PAUL A [US], et al) [A] 1,9,14 * column 5, line 37 - line 49; figure 3 *;
 [D]JPH05504740  ;
 [A]EP0563603  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1,9,14 * column 7, paragraph 3; figure 5 *;
 [A]US4516140  (DURKEE DAVID B [US], et al) [A] 1,8,9,13-15 * column 3, paragraph 3; figure 3 *;
 [A]EP0408306  (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1,8,9,13-15 * column 3, line 33 - line 51 *
by applicantJPH05504740