Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0999366

EP0999366 - Centrifugal pump with shutoff valve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.08.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WILO GmbH
Nortkirchenstrasse 100
D-44263 Dortmund / DE
For all designated states
Ebro Armaturen Gebr. Bröer GmbH
Karlstrasse 8
58135 Hagen / DE
[2000/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Kipp, Günter
Schniederhook 17
49525 Lengerich / DE
02 / Soyubey, Ismet Sacil
Blumenstrasse 22 a
59425 Unna / DE
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wissgott
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Schumannstrasse 97-99
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]COHAUSZ DAWIDOWICZ HANNIG & SOZIEN
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2000/19]COHAUSZ HANNIG DAWIDOWICZ & PARTNER
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date99121377.827.10.1999
[2000/19]
Priority number, dateDE199815134306.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19851343
[2000/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0999366
Date:10.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:F04D15/00, F16K1/226
[2000/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/04]
Former [2000/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kreiselpumpe mit Absperrklappe[2000/19]
English:Centrifugal pump with shutoff valve[2000/19]
French:Pompe centrifuge avec clapet d'arrêt[2000/19]
Examination procedure15.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/19]
27.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/42]
13.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
16.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0362918  (CAZZANIGA SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-4 * column 1, line 1 - line 3 * * column 4, line 9 - line 16 * * column 6, line 29 - line 40; figures 2,5 * [A] 15;
 [Y]US5443207  (GENGA RICHARD A [US]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 25; figures 10,13 *;
 [A]DE2536995  (NEUMO GMBH) [A] 3-6,8 * page 7, line 14 - line 19 * * page 8, line 9 - line 14; figure - *;
 [A]US2649049  (PEZZILLO RINALDO F, et al)