Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0997868

EP0997868 - Field sequential liquid crystal display device and driving method thereof, and head mounted display [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.01.2013
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.02.2013  [2013/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD.
398 Hase Atsugi-shi
Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP
[2012/11]
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
SEL SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD.
398 Hase
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamazaki, Shunpei
c/o Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co.,Ltd.
398, Hase
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP
02 / Koyama, Jun
c/o Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co.,Ltd.
398, Hase
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP
 [2011/37]
Former [2000/18]01 / Yamazaki, Shunpei
c/o Semiconductor En. Lab. Co.,Ltd., 398, Hase
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP
02 / Koyama, Jun
c/o Semiconductor En. Lab. Co.,Ltd., 398, Hase
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/11]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2000/18]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99121422.227.10.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateJP1998031055330.10.1998         Original published format: JP 31055398
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0997868
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0997868
Date:14.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/34, G09G3/36
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2001/03]
Former [2000/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Rastersequentielle Flüssigkristall-Anzeige und ihr Steuerungsverfahren, und am Kopf montierte Anzeige Vorrichtung[2000/18]
English:Field sequential liquid crystal display device and driving method thereof, and head mounted display[2000/18]
French:Dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides et à séquence de trame et sa méthode de commande, et système d'affichage monté sur la tête[2000/18]
Examination procedure30.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
04.11.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
08.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
24.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2011Fee for grant paid
19.12.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10012229.0  / EP2309482
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.11.2006
Opposition(s)17.12.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2013/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
27.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
30.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
30.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
13.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
11.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.12.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0662773  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1,3,6,9,32-34 * column 3, line 15 - line 24 * * column 8, line 38 - column 9, line 19 * * figures 5,6 * * claims 1,2,6,9 *;
 [A]EP0709823  (AOKI KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,6,9,32-34 * column 7, line 15 - column 8, line 47 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9808213  (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,6,9,32-34 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0827129  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1,3,6,9,32-34 * page 2, line 10 - line 28 *;
 [A]EP0762370  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,3,6,9,32-34 * column 6, line 39 - line 56 * * column 8, line 26 - line 36 * * column 9, line 8 - line 19 * * figure 5 *